Glasser v. Blixseth et al
Plaintiff: Brian A. Glasser
Defendant: Timothy L. Blixseth, Casa 20 LLC, Tamarindo LLC, John Doe 1 through 100 and XYZ Corp. 1-100
Case Number: 2:2013cv00068
Filed: September 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDERED: The orders to show cause against Michael J. Flynn and Philip H. Stillman are VACATED, and are DISCHARGED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling by the Trust in such separate proceedings against Michael J. Flynn and Philip H. Stillman as the Trust may be deem necessary and appropriate. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/25/2021. (HEG) Modified on 2/25/2021 copy of order mailed to Stillman and Flynn at last known address per (Docs. 290, 304) (HEG).
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER granting 475 Motion. Christopher J. Conant is hereby released and discharged from the requirements of the above identified pending order to show cause against him. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/20/2018. (HEG)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER RELEASING and DISCHARGING DEFENDANT TIMOTHY L. BLIXSETH from the REQUIREMENTS of the ORDER to ACCOUNT and CERTAIN PENDING ORDERS to SHOW CAUSE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Timothy L. Blixseth and his affiliated entities and relatives are hereby r eleased and discharged from the requirements of the order to account and the pending orders to show cause, including without limitation the orders set forth in the documents numbered 250 , 251 , 252 , 253 , 255 , 256 , 257 , 258 , 259 , 260 , 261 , 262 , 263 , 264 , 265 , 267 , 268 , 269 , and 270 in this proceeding. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/5/2018. (NOS)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER denying 462 Motion. ORDERED: The Trust's Motion for Order Withdrawing Orders to Show Cause Against Jessica F. Blixseth, LLC, and the Marital Estate of Timothy L. and Jessica F. Blixseth is DENIED without prejudice to renewal, if appropriate, upon final resolution and disposition of all issues in consolidated appeal Nos. 16-35194 and 16-35405. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/10/2017. (ELL) Modified on 1/10/2017 to edit appeal number text (HEG).
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 429 OPINION AND ORDER. Blixseth remains in civil contempt of this Court. He will continue to be held in the custody of the United States Marshals pending further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/19/2016. (TAG, )
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 399 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND ORDER re 397 USCA Order. To this day, Blixseth has not fully and completely accounted for the Tamarindo sale proceeds. He has not provided an acceptable accounting and has not complied, even substanti ally, with the Court's Orders of January 9, 2015 and April 20, 2015. He remains in contempt and, from the record, remains unrepentant. Copy provided via Ad Hoc to Ninth Circuit at cmecf_ca9central@ca9.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/30/2015. (HEG, ) Modified on 12/30/2015 Rcv'd confirmation with Howard of the 9th Circuit via phone call that the NEF of this filing was received and will be docketed in the case before the 9th Circuit on today's date.(HEG, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glasser v. Blixseth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian A. Glasser
Represented By: Shane Coleman
Represented By: Charles W. Hingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy L. Blixseth
Represented By: Gregory C. Black
Represented By: Patrick T. Fox
Represented By: Daniel D. Manson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casa 20 LLC
Represented By: Patrick T. Fox
Represented By: Daniel D. Manson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamarindo LLC
Represented By: Patrick T. Fox
Represented By: Daniel D. Manson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corp. 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?