Ranf v. NorthWestern Corporation
Plaintiff: Darrel Ranf
Defendant: NorthWestern Corporation
Case Number: 2:2014cv00044
Filed: July 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: SILVER BOW
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/17/2016. (ELL, )
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER denying as moot 79 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 81 Motion in Limine; granting 103 Motion to Vacate. ORDERED: 1. The Unopposed Motion to Vacate Hearing is GRANTED. The hearing set for 9/27/16 is VACATED. 2. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. 3. The parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal and proposed order of dismissal within 20 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/26/2016. (ELL, )
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER. The following exhibits are admitted into evidence without objection for purposes of trial: 1. Defendant's Exhibits: 507, 520. 2. Admissibility of all other will offer exhibits will be ruled on prior to trial at a hearing to be set by further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/15/2016. (ELL, )
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Based upon the record made in open court, ORDERED: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part as follows: 1. Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment re lating to Plaintiff's wrongful discharge claims are DENIED. 2. Defendant's MotOin for Summary Judgment relating to Plaintiff's claims for damages stemming from emotional distress is GRANTED. 3. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment relating to Plaintiff's claims for punitive damages is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/6/2016. (ELL, )
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER denying 53 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 58 Motion in Limine Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/13/2016. (ELL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ranf v. NorthWestern Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrel Ranf
Represented By: Cynthia L. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NorthWestern Corporation
Represented By: Harlan B. Krogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?