United States of America v. Katz et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jaclyn Katz and All Real Estate Services in Montana
Case Number: 2:2014cv00068
Filed: October 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDERED: All issues having been settled and resolved on the merits: Defendant's Amended Renewed Motion for Relief from Final Judgment is DENIED as moot. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/8/2017. (HEG)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER denying 220 Motion ; denying 225 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 228 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 246 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 246 Motion for New Trial, ; STAYED (deferring ruling) pending resolution of the now-pe nding appeal in this matter on 246 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. ORDERED 1. Intervening Plaintiffs' Motion for Post Trial Order of Equitable Relief and Intervening Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Reasonable Fees and Costs are DEN IED without prejudice to renewal, if appropriate, upon resolution of the now-pending appeal in this matter. 2. Defendants Motion for Reasonable Attorney Fees and Costs, renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law, and motion for new trial are DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED: Proceedings on Katz's motion for relief from final judgment are STAYED pending resolution of the now-pending appeal in this matter. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/14/2017. (ELL)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDERED: re 244 Notice of Appeal filed by Montana Fair Housing, Inc. Each party is invited to submit a brief on or before June 30, 2017, directed to whether filing of Intervening Plaintiffs' Joint Notice of Appeal divests this Court of jurisdiction to address or rule on any of the matters pending before the Court. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/21/2017. (HEG)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER denying 238 Motion for New Trial, ; denying 238 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 238 Motion for Relief from Final Judgment without prejudice for non-compliance with L.R. 7.1(c)(1). Katz may resubmit the motion in proper form. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/20/2017. (HEG)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Montana Fair Housing, Inc., United States of America, Kristen Newman against Jaclyn Katz Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/18/2017. (ELL)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Montana Fair Housing, Inc., United States of America, Kristen Newman against Jaclyn Katz Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/17/2017. (ELL)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER for Meals and Lodging. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/9/2017. (ELL)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDERED: 1. The portions of Document Number 146 directed to potential testimony of Rebecca Kronske, Charlie Whelan, and Susanna Darr will not be considered further by the Court. 2. Defendants may file a motion in limine and supporting brief, in compliance with LR 7.1, directed solely to Ms. Duncan's revised report, on or before 3/31/17. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/27/2017. (ELL)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER. (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS) Upon review of the materials provided by cnsl, the Court has concluded that minimally appropriate disclosures were made by all parties notwithstanding the failure of all counsel to comply with the Court's Order setting the preliminary pretrial conference. The matter has been appropriately addressed. Further action is not required. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/3/2017. (ELL)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying 44 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 61 Motion in Limine Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/23/2016. (ELL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Katz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Megan L. Dishong
Represented By: Harvey Handley
Represented By: Steven H. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaclyn Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Real Estate Services in Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?