PNC Bank, National Association v. Wilson et al

Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Defendant: Michael Wilson and Karen L. Sell
Case Number: 2:2014cv00080
Filed: November 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 88 Motion to Vacate. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The judgment against Wilson's property is VACATED as to the foreclosure. The remainder of the judgment, dated 5/27/16 (Document 87) shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/20/2017. (ELL)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 84 Findings and Recommendations. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Pla Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED (Doc 63). Plaintiff is entitled to foreclosure and sale of the Gallatin Property, and Defendant Wilson's counterclaims under the Consumer Protection Act are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all deadlines are VACATED, and any pending motions are DENIED as moot. The bench trial set for June 13, 2016 is VACATED. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/26/2016. (ELL, )
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion for Default Judgment; adopting Findings and Recommendations re 78 Findings and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that Pla Motion #68 is GRANTEDIN PART and DENIED IN PART. Default judgment is ent ered against Def Karen L. Sell in so fare as (1) Sell defaulted under the terms of the promissory note she signed, and (2) Sell's interests in the Gallatin Property are barred and foreclosed. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/24/2016. (ELL, )
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting in full Findings and Recommendations re 49 Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 6/23/2015. (dle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, National Association v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Represented By: Jean E. Faure
Represented By: Dana Ann Henkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen L. Sell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?