Gallatin Wildlife Association v. United States Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Gallatin Wildlife Association
Defendant: United States Forest Service, Leanne Marten and United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Intervenor_defendant: Helle Livestock and Rebish/Konen Livestock Limited Partnership
Case Number: 2:2015cv00027
Filed: June 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 CLERK'S FINAL JUDGMENT. (NOS)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER denying 178 Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/16/2018. (NOS)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Federal Defendants United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service against Gallatin Wildlife Association RE Order #148. (ELL)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER. The parties filed a Joint Stip (170) agreeing to a resolution of the motions for atty fees and costs. This Court's March 16, 2017 Order (171) included a provision that Pla would move to withdraw their motions for atty fees and costs with in 14 days of receiving payment of the settled fees. The Court grants Pla Gallatin Wildlife Assoc and Yellowstone Buffalo Foundations unopposed motion to withdraw their previously filed motion for atty fees and costs (158). Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/11/2017. (ELL)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 SCHEDULING ORDER re 161 MOTION for Attorney Fees by WildEarth Guardians and Western Watersheds Project filed by Gallatin Wildlife Association, 158 First MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Gallatin Wildlife Association (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS AND DEADLINES.) Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/13/2017. (ELL)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting 164 Federal Defendants Motion to Stay Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees (Doc #161). Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/9/2017. (ELL)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting in part 122 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/14/2016. (SLL, )
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/27/2015. (SLL, )
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/24/2015. (SLL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallatin Wildlife Association v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gallatin Wildlife Association
Represented By: John Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Travis J. Annatoyn
Represented By: Sean C. Duffy
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: John P. Tustin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanne Marten
Represented By: Travis J. Annatoyn
Represented By: Sean C. Duffy
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: John P. Tustin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Travis J. Annatoyn
Represented By: Sean C. Duffy
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: John P. Tustin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Helle Livestock
Represented By: Robert Thomas Cameron
Represented By: Dana L. Hupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Rebish/Konen Livestock Limited Partnership
Represented By: Robert Thomas Cameron
Represented By: Dana L. Hupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?