Gotcher et al v. Duffie
Plaintiff: Steve Gotcher and Sharon Gotcher
Defendant: Mary Kay Duffie
Case Number: 2:2015cv00034
Filed: July 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Sharon Gotcher, Steve Gotcher against Mary Kay Duffie Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/4/2017. (ELL)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 IT IS ORDERED: 1. The United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Montana's Memorandum of Decision on June 3, 2015 is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/14/2017. (ELL)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED: 1. Ms. Duffie's Motion to Transfer Case #MT-15-1201 to the United States Circuit District Court of Appeals is GRANTED. 2. The appeal in the matter shall be referred to the District Cort of Montana. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/22/2017. (ELL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gotcher et al v. Duffie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Gotcher
Represented By: Kevin E. Vainio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Gotcher
Represented By: Kevin E. Vainio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Kay Duffie
Represented By: Mark S. Hilario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?