Glasser et al v. Blixseth et al
Plaintiff: Brian A. Glasser and Marc S. Kirschner, Trustee of Yellowstone Club Liquidating Trust
Defendant: Beau Blixseth, Timothy L. Blixseth, Desert Ranch Management LLC, Desert Ranch LLLP, Does 1 through 100, George Mack, Byron, LLP Thornton and XYZ Corp. 1-100
Case Number: 2:2015cv00040
Filed: July 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 11 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/1/2020. (HEG)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDERED: The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal and proposed order of dismissal within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/18/2018. (HEG)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting 178 MOTION to be Absent from Settlement Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Desert Ranch LLLP, Desert Ranch Management LLC, and their counsel are excused from appearing at the settlement conference in this matter on Monday, September 10, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 9/5/2018. (NOS)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDERED: The Trust shall have on or before 4:45 p.m. on July 13, 2018, in which to file a brief directed to whether trial of the remaining issues on Count II of the Complaint should be to the Court or to a jury. Thornton Byron, LLP shall have on or before 4:45 p.m. on July 20, 2018, to file a response brief. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/26/2018. (HEG)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting 164 Motion to Stay this action as against Desert Ranch Management, LLC. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/8/2018. (ASG)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 159 Motion for Entry of an Order Lifting Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/5/2018. (ASG)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING INJUNCTION ORDER (Bankr. Doc. 216). Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/15/2018. (NOS)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER AND JUDGMENT in favor of Brian A. Glasser against Desert Ranch LLLP. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: Plaintiff Glasser, as Trustee of the Yellowstone Club Liquidating Trust, is awarded judgment against Defendant Desert Ranch LLLP only as to County 1 of the Complaint in the principal amount of $174,414,342.00 USD. Prejudgment interest on the claim is waived. Post-judgment interest will accrue at the rate specified in 28 USC Section 1961 from and after the date of entry of judgment. the judgmen t entered is limited to judgment against Desert Ranch LLLP only on the amount of $174,414,342.00 USD without prejudgment interest. Such judgment shall not for any purpose be deemed to be or considered as a final judgment subject to appellate re view or from which post judgment relief may be sought unless and until final judgment has been entered on all claims pending against Defendants Desert Ranch Management LLC, Timothy Blixseth, Beau Blixseth and Thornton Byron LLP. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/13/2017. (ELL)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER. On September 28, 2017, the Court issued its Order setting a hearing on issues relevant to entry of the Stipulated Judgment for 10:00 am on 10/13/17. This hearing is expected to proceed as scheduled. Upon completion of the entry of stipulated j udgment hearing, the Court will take up and address issues relevant to the form and content of the current proposed FPTO (See Order for Complete Details.) Helena R. Frazer, Chapter 7 Trustee, and her counsel of record, are invited to attend and participate at the 10/13/17 hearing. Copy mailed by US Mail to Chapter 7 Trustee, Helen R. Frazer, Laurel R. Zaeske, Esq., 2211 Michelson Drive, 7th Floor, Irvine, CA 92612. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/29/2017. (ELL)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDERED: Each party shall have to and incl 8/25/17 to fully address and rectify all the pretrial order deficiencies outlined above. Failure to comply may result in the exclusion at trial of matters not properly disclosed. 2. On or before 9/1/17 Pla shall file a brief directed to all issues deemed capable of pretrial resolution raised by the proposed pretrial order. On or before 9/22/17, each defendant shall file a resp brief. An optional reply brief by Pla may be filed on or before 10/6/17. Brief must comply with the requirements of LR 7.1(d)(2). The Court will schedule an additional status conf to address pretrial issues and the form of the pretrial order if necessary. FURTHER ORDERED: In the interest of clarification of the record an d appropriate disposition of the issues, the case will proceed to trial on Pla's claims in Count I against Desert Ranch LLLP, Desert Ranch Management LLC, Timothy Blixseth, and Beau Blixseth, Claims against Thornton Byron LLP in Counts II and III will be set for separate trial by further order of Court. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/14/2017. (ELL)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER re 114 Order Setting, 120 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Beau Blixseth. ORDERED: The Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/10/2017. (ELL)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER denying 88 Motion to Sever; denying 97 Motion to Sever (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS) Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/8/2017. (ELL)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER withdrawing 90 Motion for Leave to File; granting 103 Motion. ORDERED: This Court's stay order of 4/29/16 is lifted for the sole purpose of granting the Trust's pending Motion for an Order Withdrawing Motion for Leave to File Mo tion for Order to Show Cause Why Timothy L. Blixseth and Jessica E. Ferguson (Blixseth) Should not be Held in Contempt of Court. 2. The Motion for Leave to File Motion for Order Directing Timothy L Blixseth and Jessica F. Blixseth to Show Cause why They Should not be Held in Contempt of Court is WITHDRAWN. (See Order for Further Details). Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/10/2017. (ELL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glasser et al v. Blixseth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beau Blixseth
Represented By: Jon R. Binney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy L. Blixseth
Represented By: Phillip John DeFelice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Ranch Management LLC
Represented By: Phillip John DeFelice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Ranch LLLP
Represented By: Phillip John DeFelice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Mack
Represented By: Harold V. Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron, LLP Thornton
Represented By: Mark A. Ellingsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corp. 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian A. Glasser
Represented By: Kevin W. Barrett
Represented By: Shane Coleman
Represented By: Charles W. Hingle
Represented By: Steven L. Hoard
Represented By: John G. Turner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc S. Kirschner, Trustee of Yellowstone Club Liquidating Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?