Peterich v. Dr. McGree et al
Plaintiff: Robert Peterich
Defendant: Laci Williams, Mark Johnson, Butte Silver Bow County Jail and Dr. McGree
Case Number: 2:2015cv00065
Filed: November 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: SILVER BOW
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 JUDGMENT in favor of Dr. McGree, Laci Williams, Mark Johnson against Robert Peterich. Copy mailed to Peterich. (HEG)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ADOPTING 57 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; denying 56 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/27/2016. Mailed to Peterich. (TAG, )
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. ; granting 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 22 Motion to Amend/Correct; adopting Findings and Recommendations re 31 Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/10/2016. (SLL, )
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/16/2015. (SLL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterich v. Dr. McGree et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Peterich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laci Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butte Silver Bow County Jail
Represented By: Brendon J. Rohan
Represented By: Mark Thieszen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. McGree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?