Woods v. NorthWestern Energy
Plaintiff: Cathy Woods
Defendant: NorthWestern Energy
Case Number: 2:2016cv00008
Filed: March 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: SILVER BOW
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of NorthWestern Corporation against Cathy Woods. (ELL)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. ORDERED: This action is DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs, for failure to prosecute and for failure and refusal to comply with the orders of this Court. All pending deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/22/2017. (ELL)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED: Pla ppt stmt, amended in compliance w/L.R. 16.2 to cure the stated deficiencies, shall be filed on or before MARCH 10, 2017. 2. Complete copies of all expert reports shall be served upon opposing cnsl and filed on or before MARCH 10, 2017. 3. Separate written disclosures of all non-retained experts shall be served upon opposing cnsl and filed by on or before MARCH 10, 2017. All other matters and deadlines in the Court's Order of June 13, 2016 remain in full force and effect. (PLEASE READ THE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS) Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/6/2017. (ELL) Modified on 3/6/2017 to correct typo (ELL).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. NorthWestern Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Woods
Represented By: Jeffrey Wade Dahood
Represented By: Wade Dahood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NorthWestern Energy
Represented By: Patrick T. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?