Calder et al v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Calder and Wanita Richardson
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Transunion LLC and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00033
Filed: June 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that dismissal stipulated by the parties shall be and hereby is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that all claims of Pla Brandon Calder and Wanita Richardson against Deft Experian Information Solutions, Inc. are dismissed, with prejudice. Pla's Brandon Calder and Wanita Richardson and Dft Experian Information Solutions, Inc., shall each bear their own costs and atty fees. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/10/2017. (ELL)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/16/2016. (ELL, )
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Katherine Carlton Robinson. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 10/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 10/7/2016. (APP, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calder et al v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Calder
Represented By: Robert Farris-Olsen
Represented By: John C. Heenan
Represented By: David K.W. Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanita Richardson
Represented By: Robert Farris-Olsen
Represented By: John C. Heenan
Represented By: David K.W. Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions
Represented By: Thomas J. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Auerbach
Represented By: Sara S. Berg
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Represented By: Heather M. Shumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Mark D. Etchart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?