Turner et al v. The PRG Group
Plaintiff: James F. Turner and Barbara B. Turner
Defendant: The PRG Group
Case Number: 2:2016cv00054
Filed: October 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims between Plaintiff and Defendant and between Third-Party Plaintiff and Third-Party Defendant are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear their respective fees and costs. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/1/2017. (ELL)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Preliminary Pretrial Conf. The PPTC set for March 14, 2017 is VACATED and RESET for 11:00 a.m. on March 10, 2017 at the Paul G. Hatfield Courthouse, Helena, Montana. All other matters and deadlines in the Court's Order of January 20, 2017 remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/26/2017. (ELL)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re 3 Stipulation filed by The PRG Group is denied as moot and further orders Amended Pleading properly alleging jurisdiction due by 12/13/2016 or matter will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/5/2016. (DED)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner et al v. The PRG Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James F. Turner
Represented By: Amy C. McNulty
Represented By: John H. Tarlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara B. Turner
Represented By: Amy C. McNulty
Represented By: John H. Tarlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The PRG Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?