De France v. Western World Insurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: Linda De France
Defendant: Western World Insurance Co., R. Weed Spraying, P. Weed Spraying and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2016cv00057
Filed: November 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: MADISON
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/27/2018. (ASG)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER finding as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 29 Motion to Dismiss. Pla has moved to dismiss her declaratory judgment action against Dft Western World Insurance Company, Inc. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The parties ha ve all greed. Accordingly, Pla's Motion is GRANTED, Dft Western World Insurance Company, Inc is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own fees and costs. The hearing scheduled for 4/19/17 on Defendant Western World Insurance Comp any Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and any other deadlines applying to Dft Western World Insurance Company Inc. is hereby VACATED. The PPTC scheduled for 2:00 pm on 4/19/17 as well as all deadlines applying to Pla's claims against remaining Dfts shall remain on the calendar. Cnsl for Pla and remaining Dfts shall appear at the PPTC as scheduled, unless leave to appear by phone has been granted. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/18/2017. (ELL)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/13/2017. (ELL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De France v. Western World Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda De France
Represented By: Domenic A. Cossi
Represented By: Maxwell E. Kirchhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western World Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Weed Spraying
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Weed Spraying
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?