Kadrmas, Lee & Jackson, Inc. v. Montana Opticom et al
Plaintiff: Kadrmas, Lee & Jackson, Inc.
Defendant: Montana Opticom and United States of America
Counter_claimant: Montana Opticom
Counter_defendant: Kadrmas, Lee & Jackson, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00059
Filed: November 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDERED: All claims and counterclaims in the above-captioned action are dismissed with prejudice and each party is to pay its own respective costs and fees of any kind or nature. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/21/2017. (HEG)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Vacate. ORDERED: 1. All deadlines are VACATED. The parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal and proposed order of dismissal within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/6/2017. (ELL)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 15 Motion to Permit Telephonic Appearance at Status Conf. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/27/2017. (ELL)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. On or before January 27, 2017, Plaintiff will provide to Defendants and file with the Court a complete copy of the contract referenced in paragraph eight of the Complaint. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/23/2017. (ELL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kadrmas, Lee & Jackson, Inc. v. Montana Opticom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kadrmas, Lee & Jackson, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen D. Bell
Represented By: Ben D. Kappelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Opticom
Represented By: John H. Tarlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Montana Opticom
Represented By: John H. Tarlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Kadrmas, Lee & Jackson, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen D. Bell
Represented By: Ben D. Kappelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?