Lord v. The Travelers Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Lord
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company and The Phoenix Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv00038
Filed: June 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/21/2017. (ELL)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED: Each party shall file an amended preliminary pretrial statement, addressing with strict compliance FRCP 26(a)(1)(A)(ii) on or before 10/26/17. Failure to file an amended preliminary pretrial statement in full compliance with the terms of this Order could result, without motion, in the imposition of sanctions. (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS) Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/23/2017. (ELL)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 2 Motion for Summary Judgment. ORDERED: 1. Dfts Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. 2. Dfts are directed to file a responsive pleading on or before 9/8/17. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/30/2017. (ELL)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Motion Set Aside Judgment and to file an Amended Complaint filed in Yellowstone County Signed by Judge Fagg. (DED)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lord v. The Travelers Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lord
Represented By: Geoffrey C. Angel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Marshal L. Mickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Represented By: Marshal L. Mickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?