McCloskey v. Big Sky Senior Living On Waterford Way et al
Plaintiff: Clayton James McCloskey
Defendant: Big Sky Senior Living On Waterford Way, Waterford Operating and John and Janes Does 1-5
Case Number: 2:2017cv00091
Filed: December 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: SILVER BOW
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. The show cause hearing set for May 10, 2019, is VACATED. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/9/2019. (NOS) (Court reporter Heinze notified via email of cancellation of hearing.)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re 20 Preliminary Pretrial Statement filed by Clayton James McCloskey. Necessary and appropriate revisions to Plaintiff's preliminary pretrial statement to address deficiencies shall be filed and served by Plaintiff on or before March 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/27/2018. (NOS)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 9 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/29/2018. (NOS)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. The case will be remanded to state court on 12/15/17 unless Dft files an amended notice of removal properly alleging jurisdiction on or before that date. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/8/2017. (ELL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCloskey v. Big Sky Senior Living On Waterford Way et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton James McCloskey
Represented By: W. Wayne Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Sky Senior Living On Waterford Way
Represented By: Christopher K. Oliveira
Represented By: John Mark Semmens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterford Operating
Represented By: Christopher K. Oliveira
Represented By: John Mark Semmens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Janes Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?