Tarpey et al v. United States
Plaintiff: James Tarpey and Suzanne Tarpey
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 2:2017cv00094
Filed: December 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:6703
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying 52 Tarpey's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 63 United States's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/7/2019. (ASG)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying as moot 28 Motion for Order; granting 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Tarpey's liability for penalties pursuant to 26 U.S.C. § 6700 is resolved in favor of the United States. The parties continue to dispute the amount of penalties assessed pursuant to 26 U.S.C. § 6700. The amount of penalties is not resolved by this Order as this issue must be reserved for trial. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/19/2019. (ASG)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion. IT IS ORDERED that ALL PARTIES will appear at the pretrial conference on September 10, 2018 by telephone. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/16/2018. (ASG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarpey et al v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Tarpey
Represented By: Jennifer W. Bordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Tarpey
Represented By: Jennifer W. Bordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?