Esparza v. Roell et al

Plaintiff: Abel Rodriguez Esparza
Defendant: Cassidy R. Roell, Kameron V. Brown and Geico General Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00003
Filed: January 9, 2018
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED: The above matter be dismissed with prejudice as fully and finally settled on the merits, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees incurred herein. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/17/2018. (HEG)
June 18, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED: The parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal and proposed order of dismissal within 30 days of the date of this Order. ( Dismissal Papers due by 7/18/2018.) Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/18/2018. (HEG)
April 27, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED: that Count Two: Declaratory Judgment and Supplemental Relief as pled against Defendant GEICO General Insurance Company in the above matter be dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees incurred herein. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 4/27/2018. (HEG)
March 20, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED: Necessary and appropriate revisions to the preliminary pretrial statements to address the deficiencies outlined in paragraph numbers 1 and 2 above shall be filed and served on or before March 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/20/2018. (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esparza v. Roell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Rodriguez Esparza
Represented By: Jory C. Ruggiero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassidy R. Roell
Represented By: Jesse Beaudette
Represented By: Jamie M. Iguchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kameron V. Brown
Represented By: Jesse Beaudette
Represented By: Jamie M. Iguchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company
Represented By: Jesse Beaudette
Represented By: Jamie M. Iguchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?