Briggs v. Gallatin County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Briggs
Defendant: Gallatin County Sheriff's Office, Gallatin County Detention Center, Brian Gootkin, Lieutenant Jason Jarrett, Sergeant Nicholas Walisor, Corporal David Lauchnor and John Doe(s) 1-8
Case Number: 2:2018cv00010
Filed: February 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: TOOLE
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants request for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56(f)(1) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/20/2020. (APP)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Motion for Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 2/3/2020. (SMD)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REASSIGNING the case to Judge Morris, REFERRING the case to Magistrate Judge Lynch. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/13/2018. (APP)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 21 Stipulation. The terms of the Stipulation dated August 31, 2018, are adopted as set forth by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 9/7/2018. (APP)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Show Cause. Response due by 5/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/10/2018. (APP) Copy mailed to Daniel V. Biddulph
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briggs v. Gallatin County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Briggs
Represented By: Daniel V. Biddulph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallatin County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallatin County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Gootkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Jason Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Nicholas Walisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal David Lauchnor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s) 1-8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?