Cottonwood Environmental Law Center v. Zinke et al

Plaintiff: Cottonwood Environmental Law Center
Defendant: Ryan Zinke, Steve Bullock, Montana Department of Livestock, Montana Department of Fish, Wildlife and Parks, Dan Wenk, Leanne Marten, National Park Service, U.S. Forest Service and USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service
Case Number: 2:2018cv00012
Filed: February 8, 2018
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2018 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs opposed Motion to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. 2. The proposed Second Amended Complaint, lodged with the Court as Doc. 33-1, shall be filed and served forthwith. L.R. 15.1. 3. The Amended Complaint filed February 20, 2018, and Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are moot and of no further force or effect. 4. Defendants shall have to and including October 12, 2018, in which to file any and all motions with supporting briefs directed to issues presented by the Second Amende d Complaint. Briefs in support shall be in appropriate form and complete and may not incorporate by reference any statement or argument contained in any document previously filed in this case. Please review order for complete details. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/26/2018. (HEG)
May 1, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Intervene. The Assiniboine and Sioux Tribes of the Fort Peck Indian Reservation and the InterTribal Buffalo Council are GRANTED leave to intervene in the above referenced matter. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/1/2018. (NOS)
April 27, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED: The federal defendants will file a definite declaration on or before April 27, 2018, as to whether they do or do not oppose the motion re 15 . Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 4/27/2018. (HEG)
February 9, 2018 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/9/2018. (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cottonwood Environmental Law Center v. Zinke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cottonwood Environmental Law Center
Represented By: John Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Represented By: Jennifer Najjar
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Bullock
Represented By: Raphael Graybill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Department of Livestock
Represented By: Robert A.N. Stutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Department of Fish, Wildlife and Parks
Represented By: Rebecca Dockter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Wenk
Represented By: Jennifer Najjar
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanne Marten
Represented By: Jennifer Najjar
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Park Service
Represented By: Jennifer Najjar
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Represented By: Jennifer Najjar
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service
Represented By: Jennifer Najjar
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?