United States of America v. Estate of Vesta Fern Anderson et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Estate of Vesta Fern Anderson, Spencer N. Anderson, Bos Hay & Grain LLC and Baxter Ranch Holdings, LTD
Case Number: 2:2018cv00021
Filed: March 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDERED: This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/10/2019. (HEG)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDERED: This case shall remain stayed until June 10, 2019, pending resolution of this matter as described in the parties' Status Report. FURTHER ORDERED: The parties shall file a third joint status report no later than June 10, 2019, regarding the resolution of this matter. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/7/2019. (HEG)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDERED: This case shall remain stayed until May 10, 2019, pending resolution of this matter as described in the parties' Status Report. FURTHER ORDERED: The parties shall file a second joint status report no later than May 10, 2019, regarding the resolution of this matter. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/9/2019. (HEG)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Stay Proceedings. This case is stayed until January 14, 2019, pending the resolution of this matter as described in the parties' motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report no later than January 14, 2019, regarding the resolution of this matter. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/20/2018. (HEG)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying in part 11 Motion for Relief from Order. On or before July 6, 2018, counsel for all parties shall meet and confer and propose to the Court, by stipulation, a specific program for address and resolution of all issues relevant to Bos Hay & Grain LLC's interest as a party in this action. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/7/2018. (NOS)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Plaintiff forthwith shall take all steps necessary and appropriate to either move for default of Defendant Bos or to dismiss it from the case. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/4/2018. (NOS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Estate of Vesta Fern Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Aaron M. Bailey
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Vesta Fern Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer N. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bos Hay & Grain LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter Ranch Holdings, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?