Mystery Ranch, LTD. v. Rondayvu Manufacturing Corp et al

Plaintiff: Mystery Ranch, LTD.
Defendant: Rondayvu Manufacturing Corp and Dalisay "Daisy" Slowik
Case Number: 2:2018cv00022
Filed: March 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion for AMENDED Consent Decree. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/11/2019. (HEG) (The word "Proposed" was inadvertently left on the Amended Consent Decree; main document corrected and replaced on 1/11/2019. NEF regenerated. ) (NOS)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Consent Decree. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/10/2019. (ASG)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff shall appear in writing by July 18, 2018, and show cause, if any, why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/18/2018. (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mystery Ranch, LTD. v. Rondayvu Manufacturing Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mystery Ranch, LTD.
Represented By: Jeffery J. Oven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rondayvu Manufacturing Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalisay "Daisy" Slowik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?