Gress v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Robert William Gress
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv00049
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: DEER LODGE
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn A. Miller on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Miller, Kathryn)
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert William Gress. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Osterhout, Karl)
August 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Robert William Gress re #6 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Osterhout, Karl)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 8/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 8/6/2018. (TCL)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2173990.) Hannah Stone appearing for Plaintiff Robert William Gress Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Karl E. Osterhout in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Stone, Hannah)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill. Original emailed to counsel (APP)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 8/2/2018. (TXB)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Robert William Gress. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (NOS) Modified on 8/2/2018 to remove "Lodged" from this entry (APP).
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Hannah Stone appearing for Plaintiff Robert William Gress. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gress v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Kathryn A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert William Gress
Represented By: Hannah Stone
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?