Smith v. Jo-Ann Stores, LLC

Plaintiff: Alyce Smith
Defendant: Jo-Ann Stores, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00052
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Butte Office
County: SILVER BOW
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2018 16 Remark: Copy of remand Order (Doc. 15), Docket Sheet, CD with electronic record, and original state court paper file mailed to Montana Second Judicial District Court, Silver Bow County. Civil case closed this date. (NOS)
October 9, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDERED:This case is hereby REMANDED to state court. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/9/2018. (HEG)
October 9, 2018 14 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Sam E Haddon: Motion Hearing held on 10/9/2018 re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Alyce Smith. Present in the Courtroom are Jeffrey Dahood for plaintiff; Stephen Bell for defendants. Court advises counsel of the purpose of todays proceeding; reviewing matter to date. Count 2-4 are noted as being dismissed by the plaintiff.. The allegations in count 5 are barred by matter of law under the Montana Statute. Parties are heard. On the basis of the record before the Court, it finds it has limited jurisdiction and this matter is remanded to District Court. Court is in Recess. Hearing commenced at 1:00 and concluded at 1:09. (Court Reporter Tina Brilz.) (Law Clerk: J. Lowenstein), (Hearing held in Helena) (HEG)
October 8, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen D. Bell on behalf of Jo-Ann Stores, LLC (Bell, Stephen)
October 5, 2018 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Alyce Smith. (Dahood, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Remand : Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2018 at 01:00 PM in Helena, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/28/2018. (HEG) Modified on 10/1/2018 Tina Brilz to report (HEG).
September 27, 2018 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Jo-Ann Stores, LLC. (Wirth, Gabrielle)
September 13, 2018 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Alyce Smith. (Dahood, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2018 8 MOTION to Remand Jeffrey Wade Dahood appearing for Plaintiff Alyce Smith (Dahood, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/1/2018 Tina Brilz to report (HEG).
September 13, 2018 7 MOTION to Remand Jeffrey Wade Dahood appearing for Plaintiff Alyce Smith (Dahood, Jeffrey) (Modified on 9/13/2018 to term motion; clerk's office advised counsel to refile motion with correct signature and with brief filed as a separate document per Local Rules. Motion and Brief refiled as Docs. 8 and 9.) (NOS)
August 23, 2018 6 Jo-Ann Stores, LLC ANSWER to #5 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jo-Ann Stores, LLC. (Kappelman, Ben)
August 22, 2018 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Jo-Ann Stores, LLC, filed by Alyce Smith. (NOS)
August 22, 2018 4 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. Case originally filed in Montana Second Judicial District Court, Butte-Silver Bow County, Cause No. DV-18-279. (Original file held in Butte clerk's office.) (NOS)
August 17, 2018 3 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court to Counsel Wade Dahood. (Notice sent via NEF to co-counsel Jeffrey Dahood.) (NOS)
August 16, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jo-Ann Stores, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Needle Holdings, LLC for Jo-Ann Stores, LLC.. (Kappelman, Ben)
August 16, 2018 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2180097. (ASG)
August 16, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Silver Bow County, case number DV-18-279. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Affidavit of David Goldston, #2 Ex B - Complaint and Summons, #3 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Jo-Ann Stores, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyce Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey Wade Dahood
Represented By: Wade Dahood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo-Ann Stores, LLC
Represented By: Gabrielle M. Wirth
Represented By: Ben D. Kappelman
Represented By: Stephen D. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?