Smith et al v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Corliss Smith and Larry Smith
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and Target Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00057
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED: Preliminary Pretrial Statements and Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/26/2018. A Preliminary Pretrial Conference is set for 12/5/2018 at 11:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. Lead counsel for each party is to attend in person. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/31/2018. (HEG)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation re #5 Order (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Allen P. Lanning) (Lanning, Allen) (Modified to update docket text.)(NOS)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED: This case will be remanded to state court on October 29, 2018, unless Defendant files an amended notice of removal properly alleging jurisdiction on or before that date. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/9/2018. (HEG)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 STATE COURT ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Target Corporation. (NOS)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Target Corporation and John Does 1-10 filed by Corliss Smith and Larry Smith. (NOS)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. Case removed from Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, Montana, Cause number DV-15-985 A. Original file shelved in Butte clerk's office. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (NOS)
September 4, 2018 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2189019. (NOS)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Montana Eighteenth Judicial Court, Gallatin County, case number DV-15-985A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Complaint, #2 Exhibit - Service Documents, #3 Exhibit - Answer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corliss Smith
Represented By: Thomas (Todd) D. Shea, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Smith
Represented By: Thomas (Todd) D. Shea, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Allen P. Lanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?