Clark Canyon Hydro, LLC v. Idaho Power Company

Plaintiff: Clark Canyon Hydro, LLC
Defendant: Idaho Power Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00065
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/9/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/9/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 1/9/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for January 16, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. at the Missouri River Federal Courthouse, Great Falls, Montana. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/28/2018. (NOS)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Idaho Power Company identifying Corporate Parent ADACORP, Inc. for Idaho Power Company.. (Coleman, Shane)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand - ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND - by Idaho Power Company. (Coleman, Shane)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clark Canyon Hydro, LLC. Idaho Power Company served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Shaffer, Ryan)
October 10, 2018 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2206604. (ASG)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Idaho Power Company. Original mailed to Counsel. (ASG)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Clark Canyon Hydro, LLC. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark Canyon Hydro, LLC v. Idaho Power Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark Canyon Hydro, LLC
Represented By: James C. Murnion
Represented By: Robert L. Stepans
Represented By: Ryan R. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Power Company
Represented By: Shane Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?