United States of America v. Morris et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Carol Morris, Montana Department of Public Health and Human Services and Gallatin County
Case Number: 2:2018cv00068
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION Between the United States and Gallatin County by United States of America. (Francis, Victoria)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Gallatin County waiver sent on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Francis, Victoria)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Francis, Victoria)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin L. Arnold on behalf of Gallatin County (Arnold, Erin)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Gallatin County on October 31, 2018 by United States of America. (Hornbein, Melissa)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Montana Department of Health and Human Services on October 31, 2018 by United States of America. (Hornbein, Melissa)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Carol Morris on October 31, 2018 by United States of America. (Hornbein, Melissa)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exh A - Prom. Note, #2 Exh B - Deed of Trust, #3 Exh C - Deed of Trust, #4 Exh D - Assignments of Deed of Trust, #5 Exh E - Cert. of Indebtedness, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL) Modified on 10/31/2018 to reflect case opened CV 18-68-Bu-BMM(KJL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Morris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Department of Public Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallatin County
Represented By: Erin L. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?