Quiros et al v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Marjorie Quiros and Cory Leinweber
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company and Jessica Pierce
Case Number: 2:2019cv00003
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Oblander, Stephanie)
February 19, 2019 Remark: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and Plaintiffs filing of Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Doc. 8, Defendant Jessica Pierce is dismissed with prejudice as of 2/15/19. (NOS)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The hearing to address jurisdiction scheduled for 2/20/2019 is VACATED. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 11:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/12/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/12/2019. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/15/2019. (JDR)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Alex Stacey by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Oblander, Stephanie)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cory Leinweber, Marjorie Quiros (Stalpes, Justin)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony F. Jackson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Jackson, Anthony) (Modified on 2/14/2019 to correct filing attorney.) (NOS)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED: The Court will conduct a hearing to address remaining jurisdictional concerns at 10:00 a.m. on February 20, 2019, at the Paul G. Hatfield Courthouse, Courtroom I, Helena, Montana. Julie Lake to report . Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/13/2019. (HEG) Modified on 2/14/2019 to add reporter info (HEG).
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Jessica Pierce filed by Marjorie Quiros, Cory Leinweber. (NOS)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Jessica Pierce filed by Marjorie Quiros, Cory Leinweber. (NOS)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Receipt of State Court Documents. Case originally filed in Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, as Cause No. CV-18-1162A. Case file to be held in Butte clerk's office. (Attachments: #1 State Court documents) (NOS)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Oblander, Stephanie)
January 9, 2019 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number MTX400013223. (NOS)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, case number DV-18-1162A, filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quiros et al v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie A. Oblander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Quiros
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Represented By: Anthony F. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Leinweber
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Represented By: Anthony F. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?