McKernan v. Harrington Company et al
Plaintiff: Dave McKernan
Defendant: Harrington Company and Golden West Enterprises
Case Number: 2:2019cv00021
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Golden West Enterprises, Harrington Company. (Mahe, Kathryn)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Golden West Enterprises, Harrington Company. (Mahe, Kathryn)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Dave McKernan. (Gallagher, Patrick)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Dave McKernan. (Gallagher, Patrick)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing that July 9, 2019 pretrial conference be conducted by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/19/2019. (TCL)
June 19, 2019 Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch to reflect time set forth in written order. (KJL)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dave McKernan. (APP)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT PLEADINGS (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing) (APP)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge Lynch as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Kathryn Mahe, Justin K. Cole, Patrick T. Gallagher. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/7/2019. (APP)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Golden West Enterprises, Harrington Company. (Mahe, Kathryn)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Golden West Enterprises, Harrington Company. (Mahe, Kathryn)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/2/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/2/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/2/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2019 at 10:00 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/8/2019. (TCL)
May 7, 2019 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2306181. (NOS)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Silver Bow County, case number DV-19-55 filed by Golden West Enterprises and Harrington Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Exhibit C - Summons) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKernan v. Harrington Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrington Company
Represented By: Kathryn Mahe
Represented By: Justin K. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden West Enterprises
Represented By: Kathryn Mahe
Represented By: Justin K. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave McKernan
Represented By: Patrick T. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?