Murphy v. Ted's Montana Grill, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ryan P. Murphy
Defendant: Ted's Montana Grill, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00022
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 NOTICE from the Clerk of Court's Office: On June 17, 2019, the parties filed a Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Doc. 5) signed by all parties who have appeared. Therefore, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is dismissed in accordance with the filing of the Parties' Stipulation of Dismissal and without further order of the Court. (NOS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Stipulated Motion Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice Paul Grigsby appearing for Plaintiff Ryan P. Murphy (Grigsby, Paul)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for July 11, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. at the Missoula River Federal Courthouse, Great Falls, MT. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/3/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/3/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/3/2019. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/30/2019. (NOS)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Ted's Montana Grill, Inc. filed by Ryan P. Murphy. (NOS)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. Case original filed in Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, Cause No. DV 18-1308B. (Attachments: #1 Doc 2. - Notice of Filing Removal) (Original filed held in Butte clerk's office.) (NOS)
May 10, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2307859 (KJL)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ted's Montana Grill, Inc. from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, case number DV 18-1308B., filed by Ted's Montana Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Business Information, #3 Exhibit C-Pl's Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit D-State Court Pleadings, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Ted's Montana Grill, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan P. Murphy
Represented By: Paul Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted's Montana Grill, Inc.
Represented By: Leonard H. Smith
Represented By: John W Harkins, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?