Sample v. Reier Broadcasting Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Joseph S. Sample
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Department, Montana Department of Revenue, Montana Department of Labor and Industry, Reier Broadcasting Corp. and Reier Broadcasting Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00025
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Remark: On July 3, 2019, the Plaintiff filed a Notice of Dismissal (Doc. 3). Since the adverse party in this action has not filed an answer or summary judgment motion, this case is dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and without further order of the Court. (NOS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joseph S. Sample (Hingle, Charles)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Montana Department of Labor and Industry, Montana Department of Revenue, Reier Broadcasting Company, Inc., Reier Broadcasting Corp., United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Department. (Originals mailed to Plaintiff's counsel.) (NOS)
June 12, 2019 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2322986. (NOS)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Montana Department of Labor and Industry, Montana Department of Revenue, Reier Broadcasting Company, Inc., Reier Broadcasting Corp., United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Department, filed by Joseph S. Sample. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Business Loan Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Commercial Security Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Commercial Guaranty, #5 Exhibit E - Intercreditor Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - First Modification and Reaffirmation of Note, #7 Exhibit G - Second Amended and Restated Promissory Note, #8 Exhibit H - Security Agreement, #9 Exhibit I - Second Modification and Reaffirmation of Note, #10 Exhibit J - 2002-07-22 UCC, #11 Exhibit K - 2007-04-06 UCC, #12 Exhibit L - 2012-02-03 UCC, #13 Exhibit M - 2017-05-04 UCC, #14 Exhibit N - UCC Debtor Search Certificate, #15 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sample v. Reier Broadcasting Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph S. Sample
Represented By: John D. Sullivan
Represented By: Charles W. Hingle
Represented By: Brianne C. McClafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Department of Labor and Industry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reier Broadcasting Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reier Broadcasting Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?