Saunders Outdoor Advertising, Inc. v. Aspen Management, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Saunders Outdoor Advertising, Inc.
Defendant: Aspen Management, LLC and Butana Sand and Gravel, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00026
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 Defendant Aspen Management LLC's ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Aspen Management, LLC. (Henke, Lawrence)
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Butana Sand and Gravel, LLC. (Wasserburger, Carrie)
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Carrie R. Wasserburger appearing for Defendant Butana Sand and Gravel, LLC (Wasserburger, Carrie)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED: Butana's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice to renewal incompliance with the rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/1/2019. (HEG)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #6 Amended Complaint filed by Butana Sand and Gravel, LLC. (Wasserburger, Carrie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Carrie R. Wasserburger appearing for Defendant Butana Sand and Gravel, LLC (Wasserburger, Carrie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie R. Wasserburger on behalf of Butana Sand and Gravel, LLC (Wasserburger, Carrie)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Deposit Funds. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/19/2019. (See Order for further details.) (NOS)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 Amended MOTION to Deposit Funds Arthur V. Wittich appearing for Plaintiff Saunders Outdoor Advertising, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Supplement) (Wittich, Arthur)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Deposit Funds without prejudice to resubmission in proper form. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/15/2019. (ASG)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Deposit Funds Arthur V. Wittich appearing for Plaintiff Saunders Outdoor Advertising, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Supplement) (Wittich, Arthur)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Deposit Funds without prejudice to renewal. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/11/2019. (HEG)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Saunders Outdoor Advertising, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Wittich, Arthur)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED: This case will be dismissed on July 17, 2019, unless the complaint is amended to properly plead jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/10/2019. (HEG)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Deposit Funds Arthur V. Wittich appearing for Plaintiff Saunders Outdoor Advertising, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Wittich, Arthur)
June 18, 2019 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number MTX9-13813. (NOS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Saunders Outdoor Advertising, Inc. (NOS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Aspen Management, LLC and Butana Sand and Gravel, LLC. (Originals mailed to Plaintiff's counsel.) (NOS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aspen Management, LLC, and Butana Sand and Gravel, LLC filed by Saunders Outdoor Advertising, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders Outdoor Advertising, Inc. v. Aspen Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saunders Outdoor Advertising, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur V. Wittich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Management, LLC
Represented By: David L. Vicevich
Represented By: Lawrence E. Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butana Sand and Gravel, LLC
Represented By: Carrie R. Wasserburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?