Kay v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Kay
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Case Number: 2:2019cv00029
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 11/29/2019. Discovery due by 5/8/2020. Pretrial motions other than discoverymotions, shall be filed and fully briefed on or before 7/10/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/3/2020. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/30/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Brian Morris. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 01:30 PM in Butte, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 at 09:00 AM in Butte, MT before Judge Brian Morris. (See order for additional information.) Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/29/2019. (HEG)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/28/2019. (Law Clerk: V. Dettman), (SLL)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Nicole Kay. (Cossi, Domenic) ADDITIONAL STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS filed as Doc. #9 . (Modified to add docket text.) (NOS)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Nicole Kay. (Cossi, Domenic)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Murphy, Brooke)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Murphy, Brooke)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Nicole Kay. (Cossi, Domenic)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 8/21/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 8/21/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 8/21/2019. TELEPHONIC Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 1:30 p.m. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/22/2019. (NOS)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 Safeco's First Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Murphy, Brooke)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand filed in state court by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (ASG)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed by Nicole Kay in state court on May 15, 2019. (ASG)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of state court case. (Attachments: #1 Doc 2, #2 Doc 3, #3 Doc 4, #4 Doc 5) (ASG)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Murphy, Brooke)
July 2, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2332526. (ASG)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois from Eighteenth Judicial District Court Gallatin County, case number DV-19-529C. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 Ex A - state court docs) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kay v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Kay
Represented By: Domenic A. Cossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Brooke B. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?