Wesco Insurance Company v. Central Asia Institute et al
Plaintiff: Wesco Insurance Company
Defendant: Central Asia Institute and Christel Chvilicek
Case Number: 2:2019cv00031
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wesco Insurance Company. Christel Chvilicek served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Condra, Philip)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wesco Insurance Company re #2 Summons Issued Christel Chvilichek (Condra, Philip)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wesco Insurance Company. Central Asia Institute served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Condra, Philip)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wesco Insurance Company re #2 Summons Issued Central Asia Institute (Condra, Philip)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Originals mailed to Counsel. (ASG)
July 15, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2337285 (ASG)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Wesco Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Demand Letter, #2 Ex B - Letter, #3 Ex C - Complaint, #4 Ex D - 2017-2018 Policy, #5 Ex E - 2018-2019 Policy, #6 civil cover sheet) (ASG) Modified on 7/16/2019 to correct filing date. (ASG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesco Insurance Company v. Central Asia Institute et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Asia Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christel Chvilicek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesco Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip B. Condra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?