L. Keeley Construction Co. v. Developers Surety and Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: L. Keeley Construction Co.
Defendant: Developers Surety and Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00039
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/22/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/22/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 11:00 AM at the Chambers of District Judge Sam E. Haddon, Paul G. Hatfield Courthouse, Helena, Montana. Lead counsel for each party is to attend in person. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/27/2019. (HEG)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by L. Keeley Construction Co. in state court on 7/1/2019. (ASG)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of receipt of state court file. Original file shelved in Butte. (Attachments: #1 Doc 1 - Complaint, #2 Doc 3 - Summons, #3 Doc 4 - Removal Notice) (ASG)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Developers Surety and Indemnity Company. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint) (Etchart, Mark)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Developers Surety and Indemnity Company. (Etchart, Mark)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED: This case will be remanded to state court on August 9, 2019, unless Defendant files an amended notice of removal properly alleging jurisdiction on or before that date. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/1/2019. (HEG)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by L. Keeley Construction Co.. (Neilson, Aaron)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron M. Neilson on behalf of L. Keeley Construction Co. (Neilson, Aaron)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Developers Surety and Indemnity Company. (Etchart, Mark)
July 30, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number MTX9-13964. (ASG)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Developers Surety and Indemnity Company from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, case number Case No. DV-19-729B. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Complaint, #2 Ex B - Amended Complaint, #3 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L. Keeley Construction Co. v. Developers Surety and Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Developers Surety and Indemnity Company
Represented By: M. Christy S. McCann
Represented By: Mark D. Etchart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. Keeley Construction Co.
Represented By: Eric Ryan Henkel
Represented By: Aaron M. Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?