Dreisbach et al v. West American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Joanie Kyle Driesbach, Charles Andrew, Charles Andres Dreisbach and Joanie Kyle Dreisbach
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., John Doe Defendants I-V, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and West American Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00052
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Dismiss Certain Defendants. Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, and Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/19/2019. (HEG)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement by Charles Andres Dreisbach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Dodd, Matthew)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants -- Unopposed Matthew A. Dodd appearing for Plaintiff Charles Andres Dreisbach (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Dodd, Matthew)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/28/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/28/2020. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 11:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. Lead counsel for each party is to attend in person. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/27/2019. (HEG)
November 7, 2019 Remark: The spelling of Plaintiffs' last name updated on docket from "Driesbach" to correct spelling of "Dreisbach" per Complaint and confirmation by counsel. (NOS)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company, and John Doe Defendants I-V filed by Charles Andrew and Joanie Kyle Dreisbach, individually and on behalf of their minor children H.M.D., C.S.D., and T.B.D. Complaint original filed in Gallatin County case No. DV-19-1102A. (NOS)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE from the Eighth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County. (Attachments: #1 2 - Notice of Removal) File held in Butte clerk's office. (NOS)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company. (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
October 24, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2388659. (ASG)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by West American Insurance Company. (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District, Gallatin County, case number DV-19-1102A. (Attachments: #1 Ex A- Demand Letter, #2 Ex B - Complaint, #3 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dreisbach et al v. West American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanie Kyle Driesbach
Represented By: Matthew A. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Andrew
Represented By: Matthew A. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Andres Dreisbach
Represented By: Matthew A. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanie Kyle Dreisbach
Represented By: Matthew A. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.
Represented By: John E. Bohyer
Represented By: Ryan T. Heuwinkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Bohyer
Represented By: Ryan T. Heuwinkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Bohyer
Represented By: Ryan T. Heuwinkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West American Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Bohyer
Represented By: Ryan T. Heuwinkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?