Milanovich v. QUANTPOST, INC. et al
Plaintiff: John Milanovich
Defendant: QUANTPOST, INC. and Lester W. Dye
Case Number: 2:2019cv00055
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER:. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 at 09:00 AM in Butte, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2020. Discovery due by 12/15/2020. Motions due by 1/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/17/2019. (TXB)
December 17, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE ENTRYMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/17/2019. (TXB)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Defendant Quantpost's Motion to Dismiss Responses due by 1/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/13/2019. (SMD)
December 12, 2019 Filing 23 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Dale M. Schowengerdt appearing for Plaintiff John Milanovich Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schowengerdt, Dale) Modified on 12/12/2019 to reflect changing docket wording from "First" Motion to "Second" Motion (APP).
December 12, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QUANTPOST, INC.. (Strauch, Timothy)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Judge Morris. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Judge DeSoto. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/11/2019. (APP)
December 10, 2019 Filing 20 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by QUANTPOST, INC.. (Strauch, Timothy)
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by John Milanovich. (Schowengerdt, Dale)
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by QUANTPOST, INC.. (Strauch, Timothy)
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by QUANTPOST, INC.. (Strauch, Timothy)
December 3, 2019 Filing 16 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Milanovich. (APP)
December 3, 2019 Filing 15 STATE COURT PLEADINGS (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons, #2 State Court Summons, #3 Notice of Removal, #4 Notice of Filing) (APP)
December 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dale M. Schowengerdt (Schowengerdt, Dale)
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel Plaintiff's Notice of Substitution of Counsel by John Milanovich (Brown, Bradford)
November 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Send out consent to Pltfs new counsel 12/6/2019. (APP)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw David L. Vicevich appearing for Plaintiff John Milanovich Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Vicevich, David)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Defendant Quantpost's Motion to Dismiss Responses due by 12/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 11/19/2019. (TXB)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 11/19/2019. (TXB)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Quantpost's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Lawrence E. Henke appearing for Plaintiff John Milanovich Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Henke, Lawrence)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Dye's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Joinder in Defendant Quantpost's Motion to Dismiss Lawrence E. Henke appearing for Plaintiff John Milanovich Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Henke, Lawrence)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge DeSoto as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel David Matthew McLean, David L. Vicevich, Lawrence E. Henke, Timothy B. Strauch. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 11/22/2019. (APP) Modified on 12/2/2019 to reflect consent sent out to counsel Brad Brown, due 12/16/19 (APP).
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Defendant Quantpost's Motion to Dismiss filed by Lester W. Dye. (McLean, David)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Joinder in Defendant Quantpost's Motion to Dismiss David Matthew McLean appearing for Defendant Lester W. Dye Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (McLean, David)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by QUANTPOST, INC.. (Strauch, Timothy)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Timothy B. Strauch appearing for Defendant QUANTPOST, INC. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Strauch, Timothy)
October 28, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2390144 (TAG)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lester W. Dye from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Silver Bow County, case number DV-19-271RW. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milanovich v. QUANTPOST, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUANTPOST, INC.
Represented By: Timothy B. Strauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester W. Dye
Represented By: David Matthew McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Milanovich
Represented By: David L. Vicevich
Represented By: Lawrence E. Henke
Represented By: Dale M. Schowengerdt
Represented By: Bradford James Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?