Arnold et al v. Allianz Global Risks Us Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Heidi Arnold and Lee Arnold
Defendant: Cal Arnold, Kestrel Leasing, LLC and Allianz Global Risks Us Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00061
Filed: December 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Remand Replies due by 2/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 2/5/2020. (SMD)
February 4, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand Benjamin Joseph Alke appearing for Plaintiffs Heidi Arnold, Lee Arnold Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Alke, Benjamin)
February 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Heidi Arnold, Lee Arnold Notice of Firm Name Change and Notice of Appearance of Co-Counsel (Alke, Benjamin)
January 28, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Assignment, #3 Exhibit 3 - Check, #4 Exhibit 4 - Check, #5 Exhibit 5 - Check) (Ranta, Katie)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Remand Responses due by 1/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 1/17/2020. (TXB)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Remand Katie Rose Ranta appearing for Defendant Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ranta, Katie)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/11/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/11/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/11/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 1/7/2020. (APP)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Heidi Arnold, Lee Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Alke, Benjamin)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand Benjamin Joseph Alke appearing for Plaintiffs Heidi Arnold, Lee Arnold Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Alke, Benjamin)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Cal Arnold, and Kestrel Leasing, LLC filed by Lee Arnold, Heidi Arnold on October 31, 2019. (NOS)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. (Attachments: #1 2 - Summons, #2 3 - Proof of Service, #3 4 - Motion for Judge Substitution, #4 5 - Notice of Filing Removal, #5 6 - Order calling in Judge Brown) Original file held in Butte clerk's office. (NOS)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allianz Global Risks Us Insurance Company. (Ranta, Katie)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge DeSoto as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Jean E. Faure, Jason T. Holden, Benjamin Joseph Alke. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/26/2019. (APP)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/4/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/4/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/4/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/9/2019. (SMD)
December 8, 2019 Filing fee paid: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2410885 (APP)
December 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from MT 18th Judicial District Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (APP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold et al v. Allianz Global Risks Us Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kestrel Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Risks Us Insurance Company
Represented By: Jean E. Faure
Represented By: Jason T. Holden
Represented By: Katie Rose Ranta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Arnold
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Alke
Represented By: Haley Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Arnold
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Alke
Represented By: Haley Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?