Nuvasive, Inc et al v. Arthun
Plaintiff: Nexus Surgical Innovations, Inc. and Nuvasive, Inc
Defendant: Ronald V Arthun
Case Number: 2:2020cv00039
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Remark; Case has been opened in Eastern District of WA. Their case number is 2:20-cv-00342 (TLO)
September 23, 2020 Case transferred to Eastern District of Washington. Copy of transfer order sent. (TLO)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER; Upon motion of the parties #4 and with good cause shown under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the above captioned case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington to consolidate with a related case in that District. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the motion #4 is GRANTED and the case is TRANSFERRED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/23/2020. (TLO)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Transfer to Venue and Memorandum of Law in Support to Eastern District of Washington Clayton Gregersen appearing for Plaintiffs Nexus Surgical Innovations, Inc., Nuvasive, Inc (Gregersen, Clayton)
September 14, 2020 Set Deadlines: Ronald V Arthun answer due 9/8/2020. (SLR)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons "Return of Service" served on Defendant Ronald Arthun on 08/16/2020, filed by Nexus Surgical Innovations, Inc., Nuvasive, Inc. (Gregersen, Clayton)
August 13, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2526768 (MMS)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ronald V Arthun. (MMS)(original e-mailed to counsel)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ronald V Arthun, filed by Nuvasive, Inc, Nexus Surgical Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Blank Summons) (MMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nuvasive, Inc et al v. Arthun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nexus Surgical Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffery J. Oven
Represented By: Clayton Gregersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nuvasive, Inc
Represented By: Jeffery J. Oven
Represented By: Clayton Gregersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald V Arthun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?