Ayers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lisa Dannette Ayers
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv00043
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Eric Rasmusson, Erin F. Highland, Victoria L. Francis. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 10/26/2020. (ACC)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin F. Highland on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Highland, Erin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Dannette Ayers. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Rasmusson, Eric)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Emailed to Counsel Rasmusson) (ACC)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 9/23/2020. (ACC)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Lisa Dannette Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A) (ACC)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: Eric Rasmusson appearing for Plaintiff Lisa Dannette Ayers Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 LODGED Complaint, #2 Complaint - Exh A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Blank Summons - SSA, #5 Blank Summons - USAG, #6 Blank Summons - USA) (SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Dannette Ayers
Represented By: Eric Rasmusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Erin F. Highland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?