Sollars v. Saul
Plaintiff: Caroline Sollars
Defendant: Andrew Saul
In Re: Social Security Administration General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2020cv00058
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caroline Sollars re #4 Summons Issued as to USA, #2 Complaint (Koenig, Andrew)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Summons emailed to Counsel Koenig. (SLR)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1) Sollars #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. 2) Sollars may proceed with this action in forma pauperis, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, without payment of fees and costs. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/24/2020. (SLR)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Caroline Sollars. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC) Modified on 11/24/2020 to remove word "Lodged". (SLR).
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Andrew Thomas Koenig appearing for Plaintiff Caroline Sollars (ACC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sollars v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Social Security Administration General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Sollars
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?