Sparks v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Richard Wayne Sparks
Defendant: Lacy Williams, Mark Johnson and Ed Lester
Case Number: 2:2021cv00020
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE re Address by Richard Wayne Sparks (TAG)
April 1, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Richard Wayne Sparks (TAG)
March 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Richard Wayne Sparks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TAG)
March 19, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Richard Wayne Sparks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Letter) (TAG)
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Richard Wayne Sparks. (TAG)
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Richard Wayne Sparks (TAG)
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Richard Wayne Sparks (TAG)
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Richard Wayne Sparks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TAG)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Richard Wayne Sparks (TAG)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Access to Law Library by Plaintiff Richard Wayne Sparks (Attachment(s) : #1 Exhibit) (TAG).
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Richard Wayne Sparks (TAG)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Richard Wayne Sparks. (TAG)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Sparks with docket sheet (TAG)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 LODGED COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 402 not paid), filed by Richard Wayne Sparks. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (TAG)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Richard Wayne Sparks (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparks v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Wayne Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?