Winters v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Shauna Marguerite Winters
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv00033
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shauna Marguerite Winters. Commissioner of Social Security served on 5/5/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Rasmusson, Eric)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons - U.S. Attorney, #2 Issued Summons - U.S. Attorney General) Counsel is directed to download and print the summons for service (ACC)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/15/2021. (ACC)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Shauna Marguerite Winters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons - SS Administration, #4 Proposed Summons - US Atty General, #5 Proposed Summons - US Atty) (ACC) Modified on 4/15/2021 to remove "Lodged"(ACC).
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Eric Rasmusson appearing for Plaintiff Shauna Marguerite Winters (ACC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winters v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shauna Marguerite Winters
Represented By: Eric Rasmusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?