Grant v. Rumsfeld
Plaintiff: William Lee Grant, II
Defendant: Donald H. Rumsfeld
Case Number: 2:2021cv00037
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 Agreement to Allow Pro Se Party to File by E-Mail. Mailed to Grant (TAG)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 Pro Se Request for Leave to File by E-mail by William Lee Grant, II. (TAG)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/2/2021. (Copy mailed to Plt Grant) (ACC)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Grant with docket sheet (Attachments: #1 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE) (TAG)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 402 not paid), filed by William Lee Grant, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG) Modified on 6/2/2021 "Lodged" removed as IFP granted. (ACC).
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William Lee Grant, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Rumsfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lee Grant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald H. Rumsfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?