Yankeecub v. Fendley et al
Plaintiff: Yankeecub
Defendant: Steven Fendley, ABC Companies 1-5 and Does 1-5
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Joyce Fendley
3Rd Party Defendant: Mitchell Rose
Case Number: 2:2021cv00042
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand Brief in support of, #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Joyce Fendley. (Walton, Gary)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #11 MOTION to Remand : Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2021 at 02:30 PM in Butte, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/9/2021. (SLL)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Yankeecub. (Rabb, Michael)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Correction: re #12 Brief in support of Motion to Remand. The filing error relates to: Incorrect Docket Event used. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (SLR)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #12 MOTION to Remand Brief in support of, #11 MOTION to Remand by Yankeecub. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract, #2 Exhibit Invoice) (Rabb, Michael)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Brief in support of #11 Motion to Remand. Michael Lloyd Rabb appearing for Plaintiff Yankeecub (Rabb, Michael) Modified on 6/2/2021 to correct text. (SLR).
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Remand Michael Lloyd Rabb appearing for Plaintiff Yankeecub (Rabb, Michael)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Mitchell Rose. Counsel is directed to download and print Summons for service. The Clerk's Office no longer mails issued Summonses. (SLR)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Joyce Fendley against Mitchell Rose, filed by Joyce Fendley. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons to be issued) (Walton, Gary)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/1/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/1/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/1/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/25/2021. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** (ACC)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Honorable Brian Morris. The referral is TERMINATED and the Honorable Magistrate Judge John Johnston no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/25/2021. (ACC)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge.Electronically mailed to counsel Gary L. Walton, Michael Lloyd Rabb. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/1/2021. (ACC)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Joyce G. Fendley ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand Joyce G. Fendley, COUNTERCLAIM against Yankeecub by Joyce Fendley. (Walton, Gary)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Yankeecub. (ACC)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Summons Return - Joye Fendley, #4 Summons Return - Steven Fendley, #5 Steven Fendley's Motion to Dismiss, #6 Brief in Support of Steven Fendley's Motion to Dismiss, #7 Joyce Fendley's Motion to Dismiss Counts II & III, #8 Brief in Support of Joyce Fendley's Motion to Dismiss Counts II & III, #9 Joyce Fendley's Motion Substitution of Judge, #10 Request for Transmittal of File on Removal, #11 Order Substitution and Assumption of Jurisdiction) (ACC)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Mailing of Consent: Honorable John T. Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Gary L. Walton, Michael Lloyd Rabb. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 5/20/2021. (SLR)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 0977-2658123. (SLR)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Joyce Fendley, Steven Fendley from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, case number DV-21-284B. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yankeecub v. Fendley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Fendley
Represented By: Gary L. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Companies 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Joyce Fendley
Represented By: Gary L. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yankeecub
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Rabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mitchell Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?