Henderson v. Salmonson et al
Petitioner: Jerry Joe Henderson
Respondent: Jim Salmonson and Austin Knudsen
Case Number: 2:2021cv00062
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 OBJECTION (2 pgs.) to #4 Findings and Recommendations filed by Jerry Joe Henderson. (Attachments: #1 E-filing Form) (TAG)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jerry Joe Henderson. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 8/18/2021. Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. (TAG)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (TAG) Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. Modified on 8/16/2021 add language re service to MSP; NEF regenerated (TAG).
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (2 pgs.) by Petitioner Jerry Joe Henderson. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement) (TAG)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (8 pgs.) (Filing fee $ 5 not paid), filed by Jerry Joe Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Appendices and Exhibits (29 pgs.)) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Salmonson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerry Joe Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jim Salmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Austin Knudsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?