Chattin v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Brian Chattin
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00063
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL: Having fully settled all matters between them, the parties stipulate to the dismissal of this matter with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/14/2021. (SLR)
October 6, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Brian Chattin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (leFeber, Bridget) Modified on 10/7/2021 to change event to "stipulated motion". (SLR).
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/10/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/10/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/10/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 03:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/9/2021. **SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS** (ACC)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Honorable Brian Morris. The referral is TERMINATED and the Honorable Magistrate Judge John Johnston no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/8/2021. (ACC)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT (State Court) and Demand for Jury Trial against Progressive Direct Insurance Company, filed by Brian Chattin. (ACC)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from MT Eighteenth Judicial District Court, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Receipt) (ACC)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Medearis, Jesse)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Bridget W. leFeber, Nicholas John Pagnotta, Jesse C. Medearis. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 9/7/2021. (ACC)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from MT Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, case number 21-770C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A, #2 Exhibit - B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC)
August 19, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 0977-2714156 (ACC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chattin v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Chattin
Represented By: Bridget W. leFeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Jesse C. Medearis
Represented By: Nicholas John Pagnotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?