Ranches of the West, Inc. v. Christensen
Plaintiff: Ranches of the West, Inc.
Defendant: Janet Christensen
Case Number: 2:2021cv00065
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Plaintiff's #12 Motion for Leave to Take Deposition Prior to Appearance of Defendant is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 10/20/2021. (SLR)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #12 First MOTION for Discovery Prior to Service or 26(f) conferenceFirst MOTION to Take Deposition from Tracy Pileski filed by Ranches of the West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Vicevich, David)
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 First MOTION for Discovery Prior to Service or 26(f) conference, First MOTION to Take Deposition from Tracy Pileski David L. Vicevich appearing for Plaintiff Ranches of the West, Inc. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Vicevich, David)
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 Summons for Publication Issued as to Janet Christensen.Counsel is directed to download and print the summons for service (ACC)
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Janet Christensen, re #1 Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint (Vicevich, David) Modified on 9/27/2021 summons is incorrect, counsel is sending a new summons(ACC).
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER; 1. Plaintiffs Motion for Service by Publication (Doc. #7 ) is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiff may serve the Defendant by publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 9/22/2021. (TLO)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Ranches of the West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Henke, Lawrence)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Service by Publication Lawrence E. Henke appearing for Plaintiff Ranches of the West, Inc. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Henke, Lawrence)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Alternate Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 9/15/2021. (ACC)
September 14, 2021 Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #4 First MOTION for Service by Publication and by regular mail, email, and posting filed by Ranches of the West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Henke, Lawrence)
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION for Service by Publication and by regular mail, email, and posting Lawrence E. Henke appearing for Plaintiff Ranches of the West, Inc. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Henke, Lawrence)
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Janet Christensen, filed by Ranches of the West, Inc.. (Henke, Lawrence)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Janet Christensen. Counsel is directed to download and print the summons for service. (TLO)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Janet Christensen, filed by Ranches of the West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (TLO)
August 24, 2021 Filing fee: $402, receipt number 0977-2716401 (TLO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ranches of the West, Inc. v. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranches of the West, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Vicevich
Represented By: Lawrence E. Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?