Duffy et al v. Kaman Aerospace Corporation
Plaintiff: Mark Duffy and Central Copters, Inc.
Defendant: Kaman Aerospace Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv00071
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 18 ERRATA #17 Response to Motion, . (Sironi, Kellie)
November 15, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Transfer filed by Central Copters, Inc., Mark Duffy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Publication 1, #2 Exhibit Publication 2, #3 Exhibit Financial Report, #4 Exhibit Duffy Declaration, #5 Exhibit October 22, 2015 Letter) (Sironi, Kellie)
November 15, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Central Copters, Inc.. (Sironi, Kellie)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin M. Smith and #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robyn E. Gallagher NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 11/24/2021. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/9/2021. (MMS)
November 9, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaman Aerospace Corporation. (Williams, Mark)
November 9, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION Robyn E. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-2763592.) Mark Williams appearing for Defendant Kaman Aerospace Corporation (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robyn Gallagher, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Grant PHV of Robyn Gallagher) (Williams, Mark)
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION Kevin M. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-2763586.) Mark Williams appearing for Defendant Kaman Aerospace Corporation (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kevin Smith, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Grant PHV Kevin Smith) (Williams, Mark)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER RESETTING: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE and Hearing on #7 MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Transfer are RESET for 12/9/2021 at 10:30 AM in Butte, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/27/2021. (SLL)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE-SETTING: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/29/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/29/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/29/2021. Preliminary Pretrial Conference is RESET for 12/6/2021 at 01:30 PM, and a hearing on Defendant's #7 Motion to Dismiss is set for the same date and time before the undersigned at the Missouri River Federal Courthouse, Great Falls, Montana. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS AND UPDATED DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/25/2021. (SLR)
October 25, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Transfer by Kaman Aerospace Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Sales Agreement, #2 Exhibit B. 2021 Price Catalog, #3 Exhibit C. Judicial Caseload Profile) (Williams, Mark)
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Transfer filed by Kaman Aerospace Corporation. (Williams, Mark)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Transfer Mark Williams appearing for Defendant Kaman Aerospace Corporation (Williams, Mark)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/24/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/24/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/24/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/21/2021. (MMS)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Mark Duffy, Central Copters, Inc.. (SLR)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Summons Return) (SLR)
September 24, 2021 Set Deadlines: Kaman Aerospace Corporation answer due 10/18/2021. (SLR)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Kaman Aerospace Corporation of Extension of Time for Initial Appearance (Williams, Mark)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 ERRATA . (Attachments: #1 Errata Amended Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Mark)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kaman Aerospace Corporation from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, case number DV-21-912. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (SLR)
September 17, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 0977-2729570. (SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffy et al v. Kaman Aerospace Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Duffy
Represented By: David M. Wagner
Represented By: Kellie Gaston Sironi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Copters, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Wagner
Represented By: Kellie Gaston Sironi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaman Aerospace Corporation
Represented By: Mark S. Williams
Represented By: Mark Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?