Dav Sub, Inc. (d/b/a Continuum Health Technologies Corp.) v. Communicare Technology Inc. (d/b/a Pulsara)
Plaintiff: Dav SUB, Inc. (d/b/a Continuum Health Technologies Corp.)
Defendant: Communicare Technology Inc. (d/b/a Pulsara)
Case Number: 2:2024cv00035
Filed: May 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION Kyle Sorenson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 273 receipt number AMTDC-3298542.). Charles K. Smith appearing for Defendant Communicare Technology Inc. (d/b/a Pulsara). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Smith, Charles)
July 22, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION Kevin J. Meek to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 273 receipt number AMTDC-3298526.). Charles K. Smith appearing for Defendant Communicare Technology Inc. (d/b/a Pulsara). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Smith, Charles)
July 22, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION Aashish Kapadia to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 273 receipt number AMTDC-3298517.). Charles K. Smith appearing for Defendant Communicare Technology Inc. (d/b/a Pulsara). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Smith, Charles)
July 22, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles K. Smith on behalf of Communicare Technology Inc. (d/b/a Pulsara) (Smith, Charles)
June 20, 2024 Reset Deadlines: Communicare Technology Inc. (d/b/a Pulsara) answer due 7/24/2024 per #7 Stipulation. (ACC)
June 19, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE by Dav SUB, Inc. (d/b/a Continuum Health Technologies Corp.) of Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Filing Responsive Pleading (Inabnit, Elijah)
June 7, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint for Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial. Served on CommuniCare Technology, Inc on 6/3/2024, filed by Dav SYB, Inc. (d/b/a Continuum Health Technologies Corp.). Communicare Technology Inc. (d/b/a Pulsara) answer due date 6/24/2024. (Lukes, Robert)
May 30, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Communicare Technology Inc. (d/b/a Pulsara). Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (ACC)
May 30, 2024 Filing 4 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Dav SYB, Inc. (d/b/a Continuum Health Technologies Corp.), re Filing Fee Received, #1 Complaint, #3 Patent/Trademark, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Lukes, Robert)
May 24, 2024 Filing 3 AO 121 Copyright form transmitted to the U.S. Copyright Office. (Inabnit, Elijah)
May 24, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dav SYB, Inc. (d/b/a Continuum Health Technologies Corp.). (Inabnit, Elijah)
May 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Communicare Technology Inc. (d/b/a Pulsara), filed by Dav Sub, Inc. (d/b/a Continuum Health Technologies Corp.). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (KAH)
May 24, 2024 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3268240 (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dav Sub, Inc. (d/b/a Continuum Health Technologies Corp.) v. Communicare Technology Inc. (d/b/a Pulsara)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dav SUB, Inc. (d/b/a Continuum Health Technologies Corp.)
Represented By: Robert C. Lukes
Represented By: Elijah Inabnit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Communicare Technology Inc. (d/b/a Pulsara)
Represented By: Charles K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?