Crawford v. Bennett et al
Case Number: 4:2006cv00014
Filed: February 27, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
Presiding Judge: Sam E. Haddon
Presiding Judge: Keith Strong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 81 in full. 63 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marvin R. Bennett is GRANTED. An appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/30/2008. Copy mailed to Crawford. (TAG, )
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marvin R. Bennett. Recommendation: Defendant's Second Motion for Summary Judgment should be GRANTED. The Court should certify that any appeal would not be taken in good faith. Objections to F&R due by 12/19/2008. Signed by Magistrate Keith Strong on 12/2/2008. Copy mailed to Crawford. (ASG, )
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 75 in Full. Defendant's 35 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/21/2008. Copy mailed to Crawford. (TAG, )
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment, and 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marvin R. Bennett. Plaintiff has until October 17, 2008, to respond to Defendant's Second Motion for Summary Judgment 63 . Defendant's First Motion for Summary Judgment should be DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Objections to F&R due by 10/17/2008. Signed by Magistrate Keith Strong on 9/29/2008. Copy mailed to Crawford. (TAG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Bennett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?